Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2021-04-01 13:10 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+806 vol |
80,442 | |
Filed 2021-04-01 13:09 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$38,667
+1,419 vol $27.25 each |
79,636 | |
Filed 2021-01-04 16:15 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+953 vol |
78,217 | |
Filed 2021-01-04 16:14 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$39,139
+1,738 vol $22.52 each |
77,264 | |
Filed 2020-10-01 14:32 Tx date 2020-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,092 vol |
75,526 | |
Filed 2020-10-01 14:31 Tx date 2020-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$40,970
+2,198 vol $18.64 each |
74,434 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 14:55 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,033 vol |
72,236 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 14:54 Tx date 2020-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$41,800
+2,298 vol $18.19 each |
71,203 | |
Filed 2020-04-02 11:28 Tx date 2020-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,272 vol |
68,905 | |
Filed 2020-04-02 11:27 Tx date 2020-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$43,367
+2,551 vol $17.00 each |
67,633 | |
Filed 2020-01-03 10:10 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+606 vol |
65,082 | |
Filed 2020-01-03 10:09 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$39,988
+1,517 vol $26.36 each |
64,476 | |
Filed 2019-10-01 10:13 Tx date 2019-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+621 vol |
62,959 | |
Filed 2019-10-01 10:12 Tx date 2019-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$40,588
+1,680 vol $24.16 each |
62,338 | |
Filed 2019-07-02 12:18 Tx date 2019-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+616 vol |
60,658 | |
Filed 2019-07-02 12:17 Tx date 2019-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$40,188
+1,690 vol $23.78 each |
60,042 | |
Filed 2019-04-01 Tx date 2019-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$41,010
+1,809 vol $22.67 each |
57,758 | |
Filed 2019-04-01 Tx date 2019-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+594 vol |
58,352 | |
Filed 2019-01-02 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+691 vol |
55,949 | |
Filed 2019-01-02 Tx date 2018-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$25,569
+1,338 vol $19.11 each |
55,258 | |
Filed 2018-10-03 Tx date 2018-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,489
+1,043 vol $23.48 each |
53,920 | |
Filed 2018-10-03 Tx date 2018-09-19 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+483 vol |
52,877 | |
Filed 2018-07-03 Tx date 2018-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+451 vol |
52,394 | |
Filed 2018-07-03 Tx date 2018-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,929
+1,055 vol $23.63 each |
51,943 | |
Filed 2018-05-08 Tx date 2018-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+449 vol |
50,888 | |
Filed 2018-05-08 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,463 vol |
||
Filed 2018-05-08 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,498 vol |
44,026 | |
Filed 2018-05-08 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+371 vol |
||
Filed 2018-05-08 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+367 vol |
49,416 | |
Filed 2018-04-03 Tx date 2018-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,193
+1,023 vol $23.65 each |
50,408 | |
Filed 2018-01-02 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+371 vol |
49,385 | |
Filed 2018-01-02 Tx date 2017-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$23,583
+894 vol $26.38 each |
49,014 | |
Filed 2017-10-02 Tx date 2017-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$23,328
+925 vol $25.22 each |
47,721 | |
Filed 2017-10-02 Tx date 2017-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+399 vol |
48,120 | |
Filed 2017-07-03 Tx date 2017-07-03 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+9,963 vol |
396,065 | |
Filed 2017-06-30 Tx date 2017-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,416
+997 vol $24.49 each |
46,415 | |
Filed 2017-06-30 Tx date 2017-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+381 vol |
46,796 | |
Filed 2017-04-10 Tx date 2017-04-10 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+12,056 vol |
386,102 | |
Filed 2017-03-31 Tx date 2017-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,916
+1,050 vol $23.73 each |
45,041 | |
Filed 2017-03-31 Tx date 2017-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+377 vol |
45,418 | |
Filed 2017-01-09 Tx date 2017-01-09 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+26,690 vol |
374,046 | |
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$25,338
+1,054 vol $24.04 each |
42,528 | |
Filed 2017-01-03 Tx date 2016-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+1,463 vol |
43,991 | |
Filed 2016-10-03 Tx date 2016-10-03 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+34,548 vol |
347,356 | |
Filed 2016-09-30 Tx date 2016-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$23,273
+1,336 vol $17.42 each |
41,474 | |
Filed 2016-07-04 Tx date 2016-07-04 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+29,184 vol |
312,808 | |
Filed 2016-06-30 Tx date 2016-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,370
+1,399 vol $17.42 each |
40,138 | |
Filed 2016-04-04 Tx date 2016-04-04 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+41,782 vol |
283,624 | |
Filed 2016-04-01 Tx date 2016-03-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$24,409
+1,323 vol $18.45 each |
38,739 | |
Filed 2016-01-11 Tx date 2016-01-11 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+44,501 vol |
241,842 | |
Filed 2015-12-31 Tx date 2015-12-31 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$51,972
+2,455 vol $21.17 each |
36,466 | |
Filed 2015-10-05 Tx date 2015-10-05 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+36,482 vol |
197,341 | |
Filed 2015-09-30 Tx date 2015-09-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$50,267
+2,475 vol $20.31 each |
34,011 | |
Filed 2015-07-06 Tx date 2015-07-06 |
$BBD
Bombardier Inc. |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Stock Units/Unités d'actions différées
56 - Grant of rights
|
+22,080 vol |
160,859 | |
Filed 2015-07-03 Tx date 2015-06-30 |
$MFC
Manulife Financial Corporation |
Fraser, Sheila Sarah Margaret
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
$46,349
+2,003 vol $23.14 each |
31,536 |