Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-07-08 07:55 Tx date 2024-06-28 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,745
+453 vol $41.38 each |
36,101 | |
Filed 2023-07-05 12:01 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,996
+133 vol $37.57 each |
35,648 | |
Filed 2023-07-05 11:57 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,747
+499 vol $37.57 each |
35,515 | |
Filed 2023-04-03 15:46 Tx date 2023-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,996
+151 vol $33.09 each |
35,016 | |
Filed 2023-04-03 15:36 Tx date 2023-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,762
+567 vol $33.09 each |
34,865 | |
Filed 2023-01-04 09:44 Tx date 2022-12-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,981
+110 vol $45.29 each |
34,298 | |
Filed 2023-01-04 09:40 Tx date 2022-12-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,750
+414 vol $45.29 each |
34,188 | |
Filed 2023-01-04 09:39 Tx date 2022-12-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,750
+414 vol $45.29 each |
||
Filed 2023-01-04 09:18 Tx date 2022-12-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,750
+414 vol $45.29 each |
||
Filed 2022-11-14 15:40 Tx date 2022-11-09 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-450,111.20
-14,000 vol $32.15 each |
14,000 | |
Filed 2022-10-04 12:19 Tx date 2022-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$5,011
+150 vol $33.41 each |
33,774 | |
Filed 2022-10-04 12:13 Tx date 2022-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,743
+561 vol $33.41 each |
33,624 | |
Filed 2022-07-07 20:36 Tx date 2022-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,999
+150 vol $33.33 each |
33,063 | |
Filed 2022-07-07 20:35 Tx date 2022-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$14,998
+450 vol $33.33 each |
32,913 | |
Filed 2022-04-04 17:26 Tx date 2022-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,983
+145 vol $34.37 each |
32,463 | |
Filed 2022-04-04 17:25 Tx date 2022-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,766
+546 vol $34.37 each |
32,318 | |
Filed 2022-04-04 17:04 Tx date 2021-07-09 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+21,000 vol |
28,000 | |
Filed 2022-01-07 08:58 Tx date 2022-01-04 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$5,007
+105 vol $47.69 each |
31,772 | |
Filed 2022-01-07 08:53 Tx date 2022-01-04 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,742
+393 vol $47.69 each |
31,667 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 16:02 Tx date 2021-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$5,015
+116 vol $43.24 each |
31,274 | |
Filed 2021-10-01 15:59 Tx date 2021-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,766
+434 vol $43.24 each |
31,158 | |
Filed 2021-08-05 12:35 Tx date 2021-07-09 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+23,043 vol |
30,724 | |
Filed 2021-08-05 12:33 Tx date 2021-07-09 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
+2,100 vol |
9,100 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 09:14 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,973
+30 vol $165.79 each |
7,681 | |
Filed 2021-07-05 09:09 Tx date 2021-06-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$18,734
+113 vol $165.79 each |
7,651 | |
Filed 2021-05-13 14:45 Tx date 2017-08-17 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$96,791
+5,000 vol $19.36 each |
5,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-13 13:53 Tx date 2021-05-12 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-875,952.70
-7,000 vol $125.14 each |
2,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-13 13:53 Tx date 2019-09-24 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$132,000
+5,000 vol $26.40 each |
9,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-12 12:42 Tx date 2021-05-12 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-875,952.70
-7,000 vol $125.14 each |
||
Filed 2021-05-12 12:29 Tx date 2021-05-11 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-875,952.70
-7,000 vol $125.14 each |
||
Filed 2019-09-27 14:41 Tx date 2019-09-24 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$132,000
+5,000 vol $26.40 each |
||
Filed 2017-08-18 10:15 Tx date 2017-08-17 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$96,791
+5,000 vol $19.36 each |
||
Filed 2021-05-12 12:42 Tx date 2021-05-12 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-875,952.70
-7,000 vol $125.14 each |
3,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-12 12:29 Tx date 2021-05-11 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-875,952.70
-7,000 vol $125.14 each |
||
Filed 2021-04-05 13:16 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$14,995
+126 vol $119.01 each |
7,538 | |
Filed 2021-04-05 09:44 Tx date 2021-03-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
$4,998
+42 vol $119.01 each |
7,412 | |
Filed 2021-01-15 17:53 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+168 vol |
7,370 | |
Filed 2021-01-15 17:52 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+56 vol |
7,202 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 15:44 Tx date 2020-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+59 vol |
7,146 | |
Filed 2020-10-02 15:42 Tx date 2020-09-30 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+177 vol |
7,087 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 14:18 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+82 vol |
6,910 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 14:17 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+245 vol |
6,828 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 14:14 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+245 vol |
||
Filed 2020-07-03 14:14 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+82 vol |
||
Filed 2020-07-03 13:49 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+245 vol |
10,327 | |
Filed 2020-07-03 13:49 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+245 vol |
||
Filed 2020-07-03 13:40 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+82 vol |
||
Filed 2020-07-03 13:40 Tx date 2020-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
56 - Grant of rights
|
+82 vol |
10,082 | |
Filed 2020-04-01 19:16 Tx date 2020-04-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+366 vol |
6,583 | |
Filed 2020-04-01 19:15 Tx date 2020-04-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+122 vol |
6,217 | |
Filed 2020-01-02 15:01 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+496 vol |
6,095 | |
Filed 2020-01-02 14:58 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+124 vol |
||
Filed 2020-01-02 14:57 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+124 vol |
||
Filed 2019-10-01 16:29 Tx date 2019-10-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+502 vol |
5,599 | |
Filed 2019-10-01 16:05 Tx date 2019-10-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+167 vol |
5,097 | |
Filed 2019-09-27 14:41 Tx date 2019-09-24 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$132,000
+5,000 vol $26.40 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2019-07-03 22:18 Tx date 2019-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+168 vol |
4,930 | |
Filed 2019-07-03 22:17 Tx date 2019-07-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+503 vol |
4,762 | |
Filed 2019-05-23 13:15 Tx date 2019-05-21 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$58,563
+2,600 vol $22.52 each |
4,000 | |
Filed 2019-05-23 13:14 Tx date 2019-05-21 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$31,495
+1,400 vol $22.50 each |
1,400 | |
Filed 2019-05-23 13:13 Tx date 2017-05-15 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: The Hedges Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-04-02 19:43 Tx date 2019-04-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+166 vol |
4,259 | |
Filed 2019-04-02 19:35 Tx date 2019-04-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+499 vol |
4,093 | |
Filed 2019-01-03 Tx date 2019-01-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+767 vol |
3,594 | |
Filed 2018-10-02 Tx date 2018-10-01 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+727 vol |
2,827 | |
Filed 2018-07-04 Tx date 2018-06-29 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+658 vol |
2,100 | |
Filed 2018-04-02 Tx date 2018-04-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+486 vol |
1,442 | |
Filed 2018-01-02 Tx date 2017-12-29 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+486 vol |
956 | |
Filed 2017-10-04 Tx date 2017-10-02 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+470 vol |
470 | |
Filed 2017-10-04 Tx date 2017-05-15 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2017-08-18 Tx date 2017-08-17 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$96,791
+5,000 vol $19.36 each |
5,000 | |
Filed 2017-08-17 Tx date 2017-05-15 |
$TSU
Trisura Group Ltd. |
Hedges, Barton Walter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|