Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-10-01 09:55 Tx date 2024-09-30 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$32,500
+4,584 vol $7.09 each |
72,490 | |
Filed 2024-09-30 08:57 Tx date 2024-09-26 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,317 vol |
45,822 | |
Filed 2024-07-02 13:42 Tx date 2024-06-28 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$31,343
+6,098 vol $5.14 each |
67,906 | |
Filed 2024-06-21 16:03 Tx date 2024-06-20 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,602 vol |
43,505 | |
Filed 2024-06-13 16:58 Tx date 2024-06-13 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$8,875
+2,500 vol $3.55 each |
36,710 | |
Filed 2024-06-05 09:13 Tx date 2024-06-04 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,518
+5,000 vol $3.70 each |
34,210 | |
Filed 2024-06-05 09:12 Tx date 2024-06-04 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,800
+5,000 vol $3.76 each |
29,210 | |
Filed 2024-06-05 09:11 Tx date 2024-06-04 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,808
+5,000 vol $3.76 each |
24,210 | |
Filed 2024-04-01 11:53 Tx date 2024-03-28 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$37,958
+8,398 vol $4.52 each |
61,808 | |
Filed 2024-03-26 16:43 Tx date 2024-03-26 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,890 vol |
40,903 | |
Filed 2024-03-19 13:41 Tx date 2023-12-31 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+468 vol |
38,013 | |
Filed 2024-01-02 14:55 Tx date 2023-12-27 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,978 vol |
37,545 | |
Filed 2023-12-29 18:21 Tx date 2023-12-29 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$32,795
+9,819 vol $3.34 each |
53,410 | |
Filed 2023-10-03 13:57 Tx date 2023-09-27 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,079 vol |
34,567 | |
Filed 2023-10-03 12:39 Tx date 2023-10-02 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$28,030
+10,156 vol $2.76 each |
43,591 | |
Filed 2023-07-08 20:13 Tx date 2023-06-30 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$30,340
+8,644 vol $3.51 each |
33,435 | |
Filed 2023-06-27 12:02 Tx date 2023-06-24 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,996 vol |
31,488 | |
Filed 2023-04-11 10:40 Tx date 2023-04-10 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$38,048
+9,731 vol $3.91 each |
24,791 | |
Filed 2023-04-04 16:59 Tx date 2022-11-03 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$30,165
+8,333 vol $3.62 each |
19,210 | |
Filed 2023-04-04 16:58 Tx date 2022-11-03 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$-30,165.46
-8,333 vol $3.62 each |
0 | |
Filed 2023-03-29 10:04 Tx date 2022-12-31 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+269 vol |
25,522 | |
Filed 2023-03-29 10:04 Tx date 2023-03-25 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,970 vol |
28,492 | |
Filed 2023-03-17 10:34 Tx date 2023-03-15 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100,308
+8,000 vol $12.54 each |
28,000 | |
Filed 2022-12-26 11:36 Tx date 2022-12-22 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
56 - Grant of rights
|
$49,999
+15,060 vol $3.32 each |
15,060 | |
Filed 2022-12-26 11:35 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units (DSU)
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-12-16 14:39 Tx date 2022-12-12 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,086 vol |
25,253 | |
Filed 2022-10-25 15:34 Tx date 2022-06-10 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,075 vol |
18,957 | |
Filed 2022-06-14 14:18 Tx date 2022-06-10 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+40,000 vol |
||
Filed 2022-09-13 11:41 Tx date 2022-09-10 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,210 vol |
59,092 | |
Filed 2022-08-22 18:16 Tx date 2022-08-18 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$30,169
+8,334 vol $3.62 each |
10,877 | |
Filed 2022-08-22 18:15 Tx date 2022-08-18 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$-30,169.08
-8,334 vol $3.62 each |
8,333 | |
Filed 2022-08-22 18:13 Tx date 2022-08-18 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
56 - Grant of rights
|
$60,334
+16,667 vol $3.62 each |
16,667 | |
Filed 2022-08-22 18:09 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$9,815
+2,543 vol $3.86 each |
2,543 | |
Filed 2022-08-22 18:07 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-08-22 18:07 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
57 - Exercise of rights
|
$-9,815.98
-2,543 vol $3.86 each |
0 | |
Filed 2022-06-14 14:18 Tx date 2022-06-10 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+40,000 vol |
55,882 | |
Filed 2022-03-30 10:22 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
30 - Acquisition or disposition under a purchase/ownership plan
|
+123 vol |
12,923 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 22:29 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
56 - Grant of rights
|
$9,815
+2,543 vol $3.86 each |
2,543 | |
Filed 2022-03-28 22:26 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$IMG
IAMGOLD Corporation |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Restricted Share Awards
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-03-11 11:21 Tx date 2022-03-10 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+2,959 vol |
15,759 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 17:03 Tx date 2021-08-17 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$55,944
+5,400 vol $10.36 each |
20,000 | |
Filed 2021-08-17 17:03 Tx date 2021-08-16 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$48,254
+4,600 vol $10.49 each |
14,600 | |
Filed 2021-05-31 18:26 Tx date 2021-05-26 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$130,000
+10,000 vol $13.00 each |
10,000 | |
Filed 2021-05-31 18:25 Tx date 2021-05-19 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-05-31 14:20 Tx date 2021-05-26 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+12,800 vol |
12,800 | |
Filed 2021-05-31 14:19 Tx date 2021-05-19 |
$TFPM
Triple Flag Precious Metals Corp. |
O'Hagan, Lawrence Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|