Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-03-13 17:03 Tx date 2023-12-29 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,712 vol |
14,510 | |
Filed 2023-03-17 13:48 Tx date 2022-12-30 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,055 vol |
10,798 | |
Filed 2022-03-21 15:40 Tx date 2022-03-21 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Belluno Corporation Limited (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
99 - Correction of information
|
-9,570 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2022-03-18 17:06 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Belluno Corp. Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
9,570 | ||
Filed 2022-03-11 13:50 Tx date 2021-12-31 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,157 vol |
7,743 | |
Filed 2021-03-26 15:13 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-26 15:12 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Belluno Corporation Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
9,570 | ||
Filed 2021-03-26 15:08 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Belluno Corporation Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2021-03-26 15:05 Tx date 2020-12-31 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+3,788 vol |
4,586 | |
Filed 2019-07-11 19:05 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-07-11 17:40 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-03-31 22:21 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+798 vol |
798 | |
Filed 2020-03-31 22:21 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Director Deferred Stock Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-07-11 19:05 Tx date 2019-07-10 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
9,570 | ||
Filed 2019-07-11 17:40 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
9,570 | ||
Filed 2019-07-11 17:40 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$RY
Royal Bank of Canada |
Vettese, Frank Michael
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Frank Vettese Professional Corporation (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|