Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2020-01-28 13:57 Tx date 2020-01-27 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-1,300
-52,000 vol $0.025 each |
2,558,612 | |
Filed 2020-01-16 14:09 Tx date 2020-01-16 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Tainton, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-600,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2020-01-16 14:06 Tx date 2020-01-16 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-1,900,000 vol |
2,116,550 | |
Filed 2020-01-16 14:04 Tx date 2020-01-16 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
55 - Expiration of warrants
|
-2,000,000 vol |
2,370,200 | |
Filed 2020-01-13 12:00 Tx date 2020-01-09 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$10.00
+1,000 vol $0.01 each |
2,610,612 | |
Filed 2020-01-06 15:49 Tx date 2020-01-02 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$100.00
+10,000 vol $0.01 each |
2,609,612 | |
Filed 2020-01-02 12:38 Tx date 2019-12-31 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,060
+106,000 vol $0.01 each |
2,599,612 | |
Filed 2019-03-26 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Bales, Kevin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-13,750 vol |
67,500 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-25,000 vol |
183,750 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-12,500 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-7,500 vol |
67,500 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Whittall, Sally
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-12,500 vol |
67,500 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-25,000 vol |
127,500 | |
Filed 2019-03-25 Tx date 2019-01-14 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
52 - Expiration of options
|
-62,500 vol |
193,750 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2017-01-25 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Tainton, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Tainton, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+600,000 vol |
600,000 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+1,900,000 vol |
4,016,550 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Tainton, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$30,000
+600,000 vol $0.05 each |
1,058,333 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$100,000
+2,000,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,944,200 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$95,000
+1,900,000 vol $0.05 each |
4,177,428 | |
Filed 2019-01-21 Tx date 2019-01-17 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+2,000,000 vol |
4,370,200 | |
Filed 2018-12-10 Tx date 2018-12-07 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,000
+200,000 vol $0.035 each |
2,277,428 | |
Filed 2018-12-10 Tx date 2018-12-07 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,370
+79,000 vol $0.03 each |
2,493,612 | |
Filed 2018-12-03 Tx date 2018-11-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,095
+117,000 vol $0.035 each |
2,414,612 | |
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2018-08-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+1,562,500 vol |
2,370,200 | |
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2003-05-20 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2018-08-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
+1,562,500 vol |
2,116,550 | |
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2018-08-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Convertible Debentures
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$3,125,000 vol $0.08 each |
$3,125,000 | |
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2018-08-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Convertible Debentures
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$
+$3,125,000 vol $0.08 each |
$3,125,000 | |
Filed 2018-08-30 Tx date 2003-05-20 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Convertible Debentures
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2018-08-20 Tx date 2018-08-16 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$30.00
+1,000 vol $0.03 each |
2,297,612 | |
Filed 2018-08-16 Tx date 2018-08-15 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$180.00
+6,000 vol $0.03 each |
2,296,612 | |
Filed 2018-08-13 Tx date 2018-08-09 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,790
+93,000 vol $0.03 each |
2,290,612 | |
Filed 2018-06-27 Tx date 2018-06-26 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$850.00
+17,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,197,612 | |
Filed 2018-06-25 Tx date 2018-06-22 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$150.00
+3,000 vol $0.05 each |
2,180,612 | |
Filed 2018-05-01 Tx date 2018-04-30 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$800.00
+10,000 vol $0.08 each |
2,177,612 | |
Filed 2018-04-27 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Bales, Kevin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-90,000 vol |
193,750 | |
Filed 2018-04-27 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Bales, Kevin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-112,500 vol |
81,250 | |
Filed 2018-04-27 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Bales, Kevin
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-41,250 vol |
283,750 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-17,625 vol |
||
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-375,000 vol |
208,750 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,423,100 vol |
807,700 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,250,000 vol |
750,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Whittall, Sally
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-35,438 vol |
11,812 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Whittall, Sally
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-37,500 vol |
282,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Whittall, Sally
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-90,000 vol |
192,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Whittall, Sally
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-112,500 vol |
80,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-26 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-176,250 vol |
583,750 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-91,282 vol |
30,427 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-375,000 vol |
256,250 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-206,250 vol |
631,250 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-187,500 vol |
837,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-856,251 vol |
285,417 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Cass, David Maurice
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ursula Cass (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-492,273 vol |
164,091 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-37,500 vol |
37,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-37,500 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Tanis Sawkins (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-45,000 vol |
15,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Mill Street Services Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,832,600 vol |
944,200 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,502,838 vol |
2,167,612 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-75,000 vol |
760,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Ridgway, Simon T.P.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-17,625 vol |
742,375 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-658,276 vol |
219,425 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-22,500 vol |
277,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-90,000 vol |
187,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Rushton, Ralph
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-112,500 vol |
75,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-6,232,285 vol |
2,077,428 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-75,000 vol |
535,000 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-176,250 vol |
358,750 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-206,250 vol |
152,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Szotlender, Mario
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,662,150 vol |
554,050 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Tainton, Gordon
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,374,999 vol |
458,333 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-37,500 vol |
112,500 | |
Filed 2018-04-25 Tx date 2018-04-23 |
$COPS
CROPS Inc. |
Osler, Tim R.
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Rical Mining Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-60,000 vol |
20,000 |