Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2024-09-25 07:29 Tx date 2024-09-20 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-66,150
-245,000 vol $0.27 each |
3,542,767 | |
Filed 2024-09-24 09:12 Tx date 2024-08-20 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+25,745 vol |
158,929 | |
Filed 2024-09-24 09:05 Tx date 2024-09-20 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-108,000
-400,000 vol $0.27 each |
160,877 | |
Filed 2024-09-23 12:46 Tx date 2024-09-20 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Norwich, Roger
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-108,000
-400,000 vol $0.27 each |
7,259,280 | |
Filed 2024-09-12 18:12 Tx date 2024-08-30 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+51,491 vol |
218,072 | |
Filed 2024-09-12 12:43 Tx date 2024-08-30 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
46 - Compensation for services
|
+51,491 vol |
251,368 | |
Filed 2024-09-11 21:01 Tx date 2024-08-30 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+25,745 vol |
73,482 | |
Filed 2024-09-11 20:58 Tx date 2024-08-30 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+25,745 vol |
||
Filed 2024-09-11 20:58 Tx date 2024-08-30 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+25,745 vol |
73,482 | |
Filed 2024-09-04 12:47 Tx date 2024-09-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+51,491 vol |
491,404 | |
Filed 2024-09-04 12:46 Tx date 2024-09-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+439,913 vol |
439,913 | |
Filed 2024-09-04 12:45 Tx date 2011-06-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-09-04 12:43 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+439,913 vol |
||
Filed 2024-03-05 00:12 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+439,913 vol |
||
Filed 2024-08-01 17:05 Tx date 2024-08-01 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,600
+20,000 vol $0.33 each |
547,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-19 12:08 Tx date 2024-07-19 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$11,964
+30,000 vol $0.3988 each |
131,278 | |
Filed 2024-07-11 12:59 Tx date 2024-07-11 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$9,900
+30,000 vol $0.33 each |
527,000 | |
Filed 2024-07-05 18:53 Tx date 2024-07-05 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$17,500
+50,000 vol $0.35 each |
497,000 | |
Filed 2024-04-26 12:40 Tx date 2024-04-18 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
46 - Compensation for services
|
$16,789
+55,964 vol $0.30 each |
199,877 | |
Filed 2024-04-25 23:30 Tx date 2024-04-18 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Norwich, Roger
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+27,982 vol |
27,982 | |
Filed 2024-04-25 23:28 Tx date 2022-03-14 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Norwich, Roger
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-04-22 09:13 Tx date 2024-04-18 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+27,982 vol |
133,184 | |
Filed 2024-04-22 06:41 Tx date 2024-04-18 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+55,964 vol |
166,581 | |
Filed 2024-04-20 12:16 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,012,797 | ||
Filed 2024-04-20 12:10 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-04-19 16:47 Tx date 2024-04-18 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+27,982 vol |
47,737 | |
Filed 2024-04-06 05:27 Tx date 2024-04-05 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,500
+5,000 vol $0.30 each |
3,787,767 | |
Filed 2024-04-05 09:13 Tx date 2024-04-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$19,440
+72,000 vol $0.27 each |
3,782,767 | |
Filed 2024-04-05 09:11 Tx date 2024-04-03 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,360
+14,000 vol $0.24 each |
3,710,767 | |
Filed 2024-03-18 06:57 Tx date 2024-03-14 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$990.00
+3,000 vol $0.33 each |
3,696,767 | |
Filed 2024-03-12 10:15 Tx date 2024-03-11 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,000
+10,000 vol $0.30 each |
3,693,767 | |
Filed 2024-03-11 16:29 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+143,913 vol |
143,913 | |
Filed 2024-03-11 16:25 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-11 09:21 Tx date 2024-03-08 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,775
+21,000 vol $0.275 each |
3,683,767 | |
Filed 2024-03-08 12:19 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+105,202 vol |
105,202 | |
Filed 2024-03-08 12:18 Tx date 2022-03-08 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-08 05:55 Tx date 2024-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,210
+8,500 vol $0.26 each |
3,662,767 | |
Filed 2024-03-08 05:52 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
56 - Grant of rights
|
+110,617 vol |
110,617 | |
Filed 2024-03-08 05:49 Tx date 2022-03-09 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-06 11:38 Tx date 2024-03-01 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Norwich, Roger
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
56 - Grant of rights
|
+105,202 vol |
155,202 | |
Filed 2024-03-05 00:12 Tx date 2024-03-04 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+439,913 vol |
439,913 | |
Filed 2024-03-05 00:10 Tx date 2011-06-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2024-03-04 10:18 Tx date 2024-03-01 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+19,755 vol |
19,755 | |
Filed 2024-03-04 10:12 Tx date 2023-11-08 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Shaw, Susan Renee
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Deferred Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2023-11-29 06:15 Tx date 2023-11-17 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$99,999
+350,877 vol $0.285 each |
560,877 | |
Filed 2023-11-28 04:26 Tx date 2023-11-17 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
16 - Acquisition or disposition under a prospectus exemption
|
$68,970
+242,000 vol $0.285 each |
3,654,267 | |
Filed 2023-11-28 04:23 Tx date 2023-11-17 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,878
+26,000 vol $0.303 each |
3,412,267 | |
Filed 2023-07-13 04:58 Tx date 2023-07-12 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$11,600
+29,000 vol $0.40 each |
3,386,267 | |
Filed 2023-06-13 04:27 Tx date 2023-06-09 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Dalton, Stephen
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Vervos Capital Limited (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$22,929
+60,500 vol $0.379 each |
3,357,267 | |
Filed 2023-03-29 08:09 Tx date 2023-03-28 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$5,410
+10,000 vol $0.54 each |
210,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-30 13:38 Tx date 2022-11-08 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
OFarrell, Joseph
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$75,000
+150,000 vol $0.50 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-29 05:47 Tx date 2022-11-08 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Maguire, John Philip (JP)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$75,000
+150,000 vol $0.50 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-18 11:56 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Stock Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,162,797 | ||
Filed 2022-11-16 16:21 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Stock Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-03-11 15:47 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-11-17 04:41 Tx date 2022-11-10 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lyden, Finian
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$75,000
+150,000 vol $0.50 each |
200,000 | |
Filed 2022-11-16 16:21 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares Stock Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
1,012,797 | ||
Filed 2022-03-11 15:47 Tx date 2022-03-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Clare, Jonathan
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-11-15 18:08 Tx date 2011-06-07 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2022-06-30 14:01 Tx date 2022-03-11 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Arbutus Grove Capital Corp (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$18,200
+10,000 vol $1.82 each |
2,025,000 | |
Filed 2022-06-30 13:56 Tx date 2022-06-28 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Arbutus Grove Capital Corp (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,500
+7,500 vol $0.20 each |
558,750 | |
Filed 2022-06-28 12:35 Tx date 2022-06-28 |
$REVV
ReVolve Renewable Power Corp. (formerly, Philippine Metals Inc.) |
Lindsay, Craig Thomas
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Arbutus Grove Capital Corp (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,500
+7,500 vol $0.20 each |
551,250 |