Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2016-02-18 Tx date 2016-02-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Steinman, Alison
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6)
Holder: 2376457 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,444,444 | ||
Filed 2016-02-18 Tx date 2016-02-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Steinman, Daniel Cameron
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 6 - Director or Senior Officer of 10% Security Holder, 7 - Director or Senior Officer of Insider or Subsidiary of Issuer (other than in 4,5,6), 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: 2376457 Ontario Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
4,444,444 | ||
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+27,000 vol |
34,200 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Parker, Nicholas Parker
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Parker, Nicholas Parker
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+27,000 vol |
77,454 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Parker, Nicholas Parker
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2016-01-08 Tx date 2016-01-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-27,000 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-31 Tx date 2015-12-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-12,500 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-31 Tx date 2015-12-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-12,500 vol |
25,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-31 Tx date 2015-12-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+12,500 vol |
1,496,956 | |
Filed 2015-12-31 Tx date 2015-12-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+6,685 vol |
1,455,326 | |
Filed 2015-12-15 Tx date 2015-12-15 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-12-15 Tx date 2015-12-15 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
81,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+54,000 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+36,000 vol |
36,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Parker, Nicholas Parker
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+54,000 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Parker, Nicholas Parker
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+54,000 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
$28,080
+36,000 vol $0.78 each |
36,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+36,000 vol |
36,000 | |
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-12-10 Tx date 2015-12-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Davidson, Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+54,000 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-11-19 Tx date 2015-11-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
13,500 | |
Filed 2015-11-19 Tx date 2015-11-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
67,500 | |
Filed 2015-10-27 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-27 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-10-27 Tx date 2015-10-14 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-10-14 Tx date 2015-10-05 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+45,454 vol |
50,454 | |
Filed 2015-10-14 Tx date 2015-10-05 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Special Warrants
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+22,727 vol |
22,727 | |
Filed 2015-10-14 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Special Warrants
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,000 vol |
0 | |
Filed 2015-10-01 Tx date 2015-10-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,000 vol |
6,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
+880,000 vol |
1,448,641 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Xie, Xiangrong
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
+5,040,000 vol |
5,591,936 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Special Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
-880,000 vol |
1,320,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
+880,000 vol |
1,484,456 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Special Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
-880,000 vol |
1,320,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-23 Tx date 2015-09-17 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Xie, Xiangrong
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Special Warrants
54 - Exercise of warrants
|
-5,040,000 vol |
7,560,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Units Restricted Stock
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Units Restricted Stock
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
40,500 | |
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-08-06 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
54,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
40,500 | |
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-08-06 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
27,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-15 Tx date 2015-09-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-09-11 Tx date 2015-09-11 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$25,500
+25,000 vol $1.02 each |
604,456 | |
Filed 2015-09-09 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Doolan, Michael Frederick
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
5,000 | ||
Filed 2015-09-08 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-4,000
-4,000 vol $1.00 each |
211,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-08 Tx date 2015-09-03 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-2,550
-2,500 vol $1.02 each |
215,000 | |
Filed 2015-09-06 Tx date 2015-09-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$42,250,000
+6,500 vol $6,500 each |
||
Filed 2015-09-06 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$8,500
+8,500 vol $1.00 each |
579,456 | |
Filed 2015-09-06 Tx date 2015-09-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$6,500
+6,500 vol $1.00 each |
570,956 | |
Filed 2015-09-06 Tx date 2015-09-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$2,500
+2,500 vol $1.00 each |
568,641 | |
Filed 2015-09-06 Tx date 2015-09-02 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,500
+7,500 vol $1.00 each |
566,141 | |
Filed 2015-09-05 Tx date 2015-09-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$42,250,000
+6,500 vol $6,500 each |
570,956 | |
Filed 2015-07-28 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-900.63
-900 vol $1.00 each |
7,400 | |
Filed 2015-07-28 Tx date 2015-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-200.38
-200 vol $1.00 each |
7,200 | |
Filed 2015-07-22 Tx date 2015-06-18 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+54,000 vol |
204,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-22 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+54,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-07-16 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,000 vol |
4,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-16 Tx date 2015-07-15 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,000 vol |
2,000 | |
Filed 2015-07-14 Tx date 2015-07-14 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+13,500 vol |
217,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-25 Tx date 2015-06-22 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,500 vol |
13,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-25 Tx date 2015-06-22 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-13,500 vol |
67,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-25 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Varrone, Crescent Richard
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Riverview Consulting, Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-07-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+37,658 vol |
37,658 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-6,875 vol |
20,625 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-18 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-65,158 vol |
27,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+55,000 vol |
92,658 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+20,625 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
46 - Compensation for services
|
+55,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+3,677 vol |
57,747 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+3,677 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+13,750 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+72,033 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+72,033 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+57,747 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-18 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+54,070 vol |
54,070 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+54,070 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+27,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-12,500 vol |
37,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+37,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+12,500 vol |
564,456 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+12,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-12,500 vol |
37,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+37,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-05-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+6,685 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+6,685 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+6,685 vol |
558,641 | |
Filed 2015-06-23 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2011-10-06 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
27,000 | ||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2015-06-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$-18,540
-37,080 vol $0.50 each |
0 | |
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2015-06-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$18,540
+37,080 vol $0.50 each |
||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Osprey Management Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+81,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Osprey Management Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+81,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2011-10-06 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Osprey Management Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-18 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+54,000 vol |
234,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
57 - Exercise of rights
|
+2,000 vol |
2,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+37,500 vol |
37,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2015-04-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+37,500 vol |
37,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2014-12-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
56 - Grant of rights
|
+50,000 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2015-06-01 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
57 - Exercise of rights
|
-2,000 vol |
4,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-17 Tx date 2014-07-16 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Barnsley, John Michael
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
51 - Exercise of options
|
$18,540
+37,080 vol $0.50 each |
74,160 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2011-10-05 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Nathun Venture Advisers Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Nathun Venture Advisers Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
-89,500 vol |
35,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Nathun Venture Advisers Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Rights Restricted Share Units
36 - Conversion or exchange
|
+89,500 vol |
||
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2011-10-05 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Nathun Venture Advisers Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-10 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-25,150
-20,120 vol $1.25 each |
54,040 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-37,821.60
-37,080 vol $1.02 each |
74,160 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-08 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
+37,080 vol |
111,240 | |
Filed 2015-06-13 Tx date 2015-06-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Watson, Matthew
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Nathun Venture Advisers Inc. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
$111,875
+89,500 vol $1.25 each |
89,500 | |
Filed 2015-06-10 Tx date 2015-06-10 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-10,250
-8,200 vol $1.25 each |
150,000 | |
Filed 2015-06-09 Tx date 2015-06-09 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-10,240
-8,000 vol $1.28 each |
158,200 | |
Filed 2015-06-05 Tx date 2015-06-04 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Aylesworth, S. Arthur
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$-16,284
-13,800 vol $1.18 each |
166,200 | |
Filed 2015-05-19 Tx date 2014-07-28 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2015-05-19 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Yang, Jian
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+57,747 vol |
57,747 | |
Filed 2015-05-12 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Liu, Yun
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+12,500 vol |
564,456 | |
Filed 2015-05-12 Tx date 2015-03-31 |
$UG
UGE International Ltd. |
Blitterswyk, Nicolas Adrian
3 - 10% Security Holder of Issuer, 4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
46 - Compensation for services
|
+6,685 vol |
558,641 |